HI HB959 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the R.E.A.C.H. (resources for enrichment, athletics, culture, and health) program in the Office of Youth Services to provide a framework and funding base for after-school programs in public middle and intermediate schools. Establishes a revolving fund to receive fees and other moneys to supplement the costs of administering and operating the program.
Title
After-School Programs; Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1128 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to HSH/EDU, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=959&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB959_.HTM |