HI HB956 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB956
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the natural resource management special fund and authorizes uses for moneys in the fund. Establishes a Natural Resource Management Commission to guide and approve the disbursement of moneys deposited into the fund. Allocates transient accommodations tax revenues to the natural resource management special fund. Allocates transient accommodations tax revenues to the Hawaii Tourism Authority. Repeals the allocation of transient accommodations tax revenues to the special land and development fund. Appropriates moneys for the natural resource management special fund and for operating expenses of the Hawaii tourism authority.
Title
Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TOU/WAL, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB364 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB956 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TOU/WAL, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB956 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to TOU/WAL, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=956&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB956_.HTM |