HI HB944 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts certain provisions of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' Producer Licensing Model Act, Public Adjuster Licensing Model Act, Reinsurance Intermediary Model Act, and Independent Adjuster Licensing Model Guidelines to provide consistency and promote efficiency in processing insurance licensing fees, applications, certificates, registrations, and renewals. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Regulatory Authority Of The Insurance Commissioner.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB944 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
SB1098 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Act 111, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
SB1098 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Act 111, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
Subjects
Adjuster
Applications
Certificates
Fees
Independent Licensing
Licensing
National Association of Insurance Commissioners
Producer
Registrations
Reinsurance
Renewals
Applications
Certificates
Fees
Independent Licensing
Licensing
National Association of Insurance Commissioners
Producer
Registrations
Reinsurance
Renewals