HI HB943 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Honokaa Land Company, LLC, with acquiring, developing, and renovating agricultural facilities. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Honokaa Land Company, Llc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-17 | House | Received from Governor re: Consideration Request (Gov. Msg. No. 3). |
2023-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 166) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-03 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-03-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1456 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB943 (Carry Over) 2023-03-17 - Received from Governor re: Consideration Request (Gov. Msg. No. 3).
HB943 (Carry Over) 2023-03-17 - Received from Governor re: Consideration Request (Gov. Msg. No. 3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=943&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB943_HD1_.HTM |