HI HB940 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Act 054, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Act 054, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates reporting of suspected financial exploitation of elders and vulnerable adults in relation to securities. Provides immunity for good faith reporting. Authorizes the delay of disbursements and transactions in situations of suspected financial exploitation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Securities.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Act 054, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154). |
2021-06-21 | House | Act 054, on 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kong, Matsumoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 728) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1094 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.