HI HB917 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB917
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a mutual benefit society shall maintain a minimum net worth calculated based on gross annual premium revenues and gross annual health care expenditures and operating expenses. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Kidani. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Cachola Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 398). |
2017-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 407) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 710) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB917 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
SB1077 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB1077 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).