HI HB902 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB902
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates general funds for 6.0 FTE positions for the UH Pamantasan Council to promote access and diversity, including programs and policies related to Philippine courses and Filipino students. (HB902 HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-02-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB676 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB902 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
HB902 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).