HI HB898 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to HTH/PSM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to HTH/PSM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the Department of Health's authority to promulgate rules pertaining to people living in parked vehicles.
Title
Human Habitation in Parked Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 114). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Hanohano, Oshiro voting no (3) and Representative(s) Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-23 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 02-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla voting no (1) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-13 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-13 at 11:00am. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:05AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1129 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HTH/PSM.