HI HB891 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB891
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture, in cooperation with the office of the governor, to develop a strategic plan to double local food production and exports by 2020. Requires the Department of Agriculture to submit the strategic plan to the legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2018 in order to codify the strategic plan and benchmarks. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 925) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 155). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 853), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 570) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-15-17 8:40AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-02-09 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB891 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB624 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
SB624 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).