HI HB888 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB888
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the LRB to study the feasibility of providing health benefits to state and county employees using a self-insured model. Makes an appropriation. (HB888 HD1)
Title
Relating To Addressing The Health Unfunded Liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 303). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB888 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.