HI HB887 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB887
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain spirits-based beverages in the definition of cooler beverage. Repeals the definition of draft beer. Applies the same tax rate to all beer. Effective 1/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 453), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 172) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Quinlan. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1006 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB887 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB887 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.