HI HB887 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority Board of Directors to set the salaries of the executive director, the executive assistant, and other key management personnel subject to federal limitations.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Same As) 2013-06-25 - Act 152, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=887&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB887_.htm |