HI HB886 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB886
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the home mortgage interest deduction for second homes under Hawaii income tax law. Sunsets on 7/1/2028. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 672), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-15-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD. |
2023-02-03 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB886 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
SB924 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
SB924 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).