HI HB885 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposed an amendment to article VII, section 6 of state constitution to use an unspecified percentage of the general fund balance excess to fund the child development account program. (HB885 HD1)
Title
Constitutional Amendment; General Fund Balance Excess; Child Development Account
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Hermina Morita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Awana, Takai, Wakai excused (3). | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 30) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Bertram, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-02-09 8:15am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |