HI HB884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB884
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county police department to issue a person a license to carry a handgun in all counties of the State. Extends the expiration date of a license from one year to five years.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB884 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=884&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB884_.HTM |