HI HB88 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all ammunition of a specified caliber manufactured or sold in Hawaii that is capable of use in handguns, including assault pistols, to be coded to assist law enforcement in identifying and prosecuting gun crime offenders. Requires Attorney General to establish a statewide database to track coded ammunition. Effective 7/1/2009.
Title
Ammunition; Identification; Coding
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-29-09 8:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-29-09 8:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=88&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB88_.HTM |