HI HB871 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB871
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a written disclaimer be provided by sellers or providers of emotional support animals or certificates or identification tags for emotional support animals that the animal is not a service animal or the item does not qualify as an item for a service animal. Establishes penalties. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Service Animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB612 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB871 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
HB871 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=871&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB871_HD1_.HTM |