HI HB871 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB871
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a management and financial audit of the Agribusiness Development Corporation.
Title
Relating To The Agribusiness Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB871 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB482 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM.
SB1270 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
SB482 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM.
SB1270 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=871&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB871_.HTM |