HI HB871 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB871
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits electric utilities from installing power connections or transferring accounts or services without owner or legal occupant consent. (HB871 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1270 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
HB871 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
HB871 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).