HI HB870 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB870
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms state income tax law to certain provisions of federal law relating to the treatment of amounts received by eligible recipients under the federal Paycheck Protection Program.
Title
Relating To Conformity With Federal Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to PDP/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1254 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB870 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB870 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=870&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB870_.HTM |