HI HB87 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 101, 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 101, 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Shields process servers from prosecution under criminal trespass statutes when performing their duties. Extends for five years Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2013, relating to persons authorized to serve civil legal process. (HB87 CD1)
Title
Process Server; Service of Process; Criminal Trespass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 101, 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 0101, on 06/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 22). |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, San Buenaventura, Tupola. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2015-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 491) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:35AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 24). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-02-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-24-15 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2015-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-20-15 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |