HI HB869 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB869
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts produce safety rules in accordance with the federal Food and Drug Administration Standards for the Growing, Harvesting, Packing, and Holding of Produce for Human Consumption. (HB869 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to AGR/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by AGR/HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-19 8:35AM in conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR/HLT,CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB869 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB754 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 103, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
SB754 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 103, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).