HI HB869 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the taking of a spinner dolphin.
Title
Spinner Dolphins; Taking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=869&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB869_.HTM |