HI HB867 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program within the department of agriculture to encourage farmers to form agricultural cooperatives, coordinate purchasing agreements between the agricultural cooperatives and hotels, restaurants, and other buyers in the visitor and hospitality industries, and develop and implement safe food certification for products under the pilot program; requires annual reports to the legislature; appropriates funds.
Title
Farmers; Safe Food Certification; Pilot Project; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/TOU on Friday, 02-04-11 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to AGR/TOU, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB732 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=867 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB867_.HTM |