HI HB864 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Early Childhood Education Program within the Early Learning System. Effective upon the ratification of the proposed constitutional amendment, proposed by H.B. 853 (2013), permitting public funds for private early childhood education programs. (HB864 HD2)
Title
Early Childhood Education Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, McKelvey, Morikawa, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 498) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, C. Lee, Wooley, McDermott. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Takai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Nakashima, Cheape. |
2013-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1095 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).