HI HB863 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB863
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a physician or surgeon who performs a medical exam on an employee for workers' compensation purposes to be licensed in the State, possess medical malpractice insurance, and owe the same duty and standard of care to the injured employee as owed to a traditional patient. Makes permanent an employee's right to record medical examinations.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1411 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB863 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB863 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=863&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB863_.HTM |