HI HB856 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a regulatory financing structure that authorizes the Public Utilities Commission and the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to provide low-cost loans for green infrastructure equipment to achieve measurable cost savings and achieve Hawaii's clean energy goals. Effective January 28, 2100. (HB856 HD2)
Title
Green Infrastructure Authority, Bonds, and Loan Program ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EGH/ENE/CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 292). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fukumoto, Har, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Carroll, Evans, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Yamane. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-11-13 3:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-13 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-13. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1087 (Same As)