HI HB855 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB855
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds new sections to the Hawaii constitution. Allows for amendments by initiative to prevail and reserves the powers of initiative and referendum to the people. Provides steps for vote recalls.
Title
Proposing Amendments To Articles Ii, Iii, And Xvii Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Provide For Initiative, Referendum, And Recall.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB855 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=855&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB855_.HTM |