HI HB855 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB855
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an online fantasy sports contests registration and monitoring program under the department of the attorney general. Exempts registered online fantasy sports contests from state gambling laws. Appropriates funds to the department of the attorney general to establish and implement a registration and monitoring program for online fantasy sports contests.
Title
Relating To Online Fantasy Sports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB855 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to JUD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=855&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB855_.HTM |