HI HB847 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB847
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires government entities to seek reimbursement for all or a portion of search or rescue expenses for persons who require rescue after leaving a hiking trail to enter an area closed to the public or hiking on a trail closed to the public, with a sign giving notice of the closure. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Search And Rescue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB847 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).