HI HB837 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows good cause to be found for an individual voluntarily leaving part-time employment where eligibility for partial unemployment has been established under various conditions contributed to the voluntary leaving. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB837 HD2)
Title
Unemployment Benefit; Part-time Employment
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 176). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Chong excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914) as amended in HD2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-11 3:40PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-02-11. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Marumoto voting no (1) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |