HI HB816 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB816
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a contract for the purchase of local produce having a value of more than $250 to be for a term of at least 5 years.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2021-02-10 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 02-05-21. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for reconsideration of previous decision by GVR on 02-10-21 11:15AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB816 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.