HI HB811 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB811
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the safe harbor provisions found in section 45 of Act 181, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, until 7/1/20 to provide sufficient time for condominium property regimes to update their developer's public reports. Excludes time share plans from the developer public reporting and related requirements. (HB811 HD2)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 412). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |