HI HB806 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB806
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the department of the attorney general a child abuse investigation unit. Allows the department of the attorney general to intervene in adjudications in family court. Enacts the Uniform Child Witness Testimony by Alternative Methods Act, which authorizes courts to allow for children to testify in a place other than an open forum or away from the finder of fact, court, or parties. Requires the court and the prosecution to take appropriate action to ensure a prompt trial in order to minimize the length of time a child abuse victim or minor witness must endure the stress of the child's involvement in the proceedings.
Title
Relating To Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB790 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB806 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB806 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Attorney General
Child Abuse
Expedited Criminal Proceedings
Investigation Unit
Uniform Child Witness Testimony by Alternative Methods Act
Child Abuse
Expedited Criminal Proceedings
Investigation Unit
Uniform Child Witness Testimony by Alternative Methods Act
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=806&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB806_.HTM |