HI HB8 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the organization of renewable energy generation cooperatives to generate, transmit, and sell electricity to their memberships. Authorizes issuance of revenue bonds to finance costs related to constructing, upgrading, and acquiring transmission facilities. Exempts cooperatives from public utilities commission regulation, except for interconnection agreements.
Title
Consumer Cooperative Associations; Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=8 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB8_.HTM |