HI HB797 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline to claim amounts against the high technology business investment tax credit and the technology infrastructure renovation tax credit.
Title
Income Tax Credits; Limitation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-28-11. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=797 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB797_.HTM |