HI HB791 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB791
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the housing assistance program, to be carried out by the housing assistance program coordinator, within the department of human services to provide state grants and rental subsidies to private property owners who set aside, construct, or improve accessory dwelling units on their properties and rent the units to families or individuals who are homeless. Establishes the temporary housing assistance program commission and positions to support the housing assistance program. Appropriates funds. Sunsets 6/30/2029.
Title
Relating To Accessory Dwelling Units.
Sponsors
Rep. May Mizuno [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Mahina Poepoe [D] |
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HSG/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB791 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HSG/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Accessory Dwelling Units
Appropriation ($)
Commission
Coordinator
Department of Human Services
Grants
Homelessness
Housing Assistance Program
Property Owners
Subsidies
Appropriation ($)
Commission
Coordinator
Department of Human Services
Grants
Homelessness
Housing Assistance Program
Property Owners
Subsidies
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=791&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB791_.HTM |