HI HB784 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB784

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that when trespass involves public land, all law enforcement officers shall enforce trespass laws, without regard to whether the land is owned by the State or by a county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Trespass.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-09SenateReferred to WTL/PSM, JDC.
2021-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 138).
2021-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-04HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2021-03-04HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 771), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB293 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB784 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback