HI HB778 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires courts and administrative panels, in certain proceedings regarding whether a person is dangerous to self or others, to consider the statements of the person's parents. Clarifies that a parent who does not reside with a respondent is still a "family member" who may petition for the respondent's entrance into an outpatient treatment program for substance abuse.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1375 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB778 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB778 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=778&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB778_.HTM |