HI HB771 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB771
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases shoreline setback requirements.
Title
Relating To Shoreline Setbacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB932 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB771 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL/EEP, JHA, referral sheet 3
HB771 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL/EEP, JHA, referral sheet 3
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=771&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB771_.HTM |