HI HB771 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB771
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operational expenses for revitalizing the aquaculture development program within the department of agriculture.
Title
Relating To Aquaculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB771 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB753 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 063, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1164).
SB753 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 063, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1164).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=771&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB771_.HTM |