HI HB755 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB755
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes appropriations to the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands for the development of residential buildings from the general requirement that one per cent of capital improvement appropriations for state buildings be transferred to the works of art special fund. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Works Of Art Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB755 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).