HI HB754 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB754
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a framework for the Department of Transportation and the counties to regulate electric foot scooters. Amends definitions of moped to exclude electric foot scooters. Prohibits use of electric foot scooters to individuals under the age of fifteen. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Electric Foot Scooters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; English, Kim, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Say, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 778) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1861) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 218). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB754 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225.