HI HB753 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals cap on deposit of transient accommodations tax (TAT) revenues into the convention center enterprise special fund. Increases percentage of TAT revenues to be deposited into the tourism special fund from 34.2% to 37.9%. Repeals deposit of excess revenues into the general fund.
Title
Convention Center Enterprise Special Fund; Tourism Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-09. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Saturday, 02-07-09 9:00am in conference room 312. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-07-09. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 02-02-09 8:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to TCI, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=753&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB753_.HTM |