HI HB740 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB740

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the fine for failing to use seat belts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Highway Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-25HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB740 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback