HI HB739 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the requirements for service by publication.
Title
Civil Actions; Service by Publication
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=739&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB739_.HTM |