HI HB73 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "emergency worker" in the Penal Code to include Hawaii state on-scene coordinators and communications dispatchers. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Emergency Workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
2021-02-16HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-04HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB184 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback