HI HB708 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an advisory committee to examine the barriers that hinder the redevelopment of visitor facilities and infrastructure in the Banyan Drive area on the Waiakea Peninsula in East Hawaii. Appropriates moneys for the advisory committee.
Title
Banyan Drive; Advisory Committee; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB539 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TSI/WLA, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=708&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB708_.HTM |