HI HB700 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes pharmacists, acting in good faith and exercising reasonable care, to prescribe and dispense an opioid antagonist to patients, and family members and caregivers of opioid patients. (HB700 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Pharmacists Prescribing And Dispensing Of Opioid Antagonist.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 399).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane.
2019-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-26HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say, Ward.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to HLT/IAC, JUD, referral sheet 11
2019-01-24HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB535 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 255, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback