HI HB70 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to IAC, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adopts the Uniform Regulation of Virtual-Currencies Businesses Act and the Uniform Supplemental Commercial Law for the Uniform Regulation of Virtual-Currency Businesses Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Virtual-currency Businesses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10
2019-01-22HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback